JALALABAD JAMAY MASJID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
mosque providing prayer facilities teaching islamic education to children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oldham
Governance
- 01 April 2011: Standard registration
- MASJID (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Azefor Ali | Chair | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shahir Islam | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nuruzzaman khan | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.19k | £68.66k | £69.00k | £59.07k | £43.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.50k | £57.06k | £67.24k | £64.31k | £56.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 915 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 915 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2021 | 251 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2021 | 251 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/03/2010 AS AMENDED ON 29/08/2010
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE MUSLIM RELIGION IN OLDHAM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THORUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE ISLAMIC FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE MUSLIM RELIGION; B) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF OLDHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS
Area of benefit
OLDHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jalalabad Jamey Masjid
Sickle Street
OLDHAM
OL4 1SB
- Phone:
- 07940348998
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window