FRIENDS OF MANGOCHI ORPHANS EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FOMOE assists orphans in Malawi ? especially MOET primary school near Mangochi and finds sponsors for secondary school children. Class sizes are 30 or less and a meal is provided daily. Emphasis is on self reliance with computer studies, cooking, carpentry, tinsmith, tailoring and organic and medicinal gardening. MOET works with local communities on sustainable gardening and tree planting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Malawi
Governance
- 14 September 2010: Standard registration
- FOMOE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maria Jose Dieguez Rodriguez | Chair | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
America Bernal Hluz | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Warner | Trustee | 21 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Johannes Thomas Lau | Trustee | 08 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Julian Carkeet Brittain | Trustee | 05 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.98k | £48.17k | £46.02k | £47.27k | £53.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.51k | £50.80k | £49.26k | £43.86k | £56.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND ENHANCE THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF CHILDREN IN MALAWI WHO ARE ORPHANED, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY HELPING TO FUND A SCHOOL KNOWN AS MANGOCHI ORPHANS EDUCATION AND TRAINING.
Area of benefit
MALAWI
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 Spirit Quay
LONDON
E1W 2UT
- Phone:
- 07552 233001
- Email:
- info@fomoe.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window