THE PUBLIC SAFETY CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IN LIQUIDATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 October 2010: Standard registration
- 15 June 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE PUBLIC SAFETY TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.67m | £884.12k | £18.91k | £19.98k | £1.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.62m | £294.68k | £145.68k | £92.62k | £43.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £5.00k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.66m | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £884.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.61m | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.50k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £294.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 SEPTEMBER 2010 MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/09/2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE EFFICIENCY OF THE POLICE IN ENGLAND AND WALES AND TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND GREATER PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE PREVENTION AND SOLUTION OF CRIME IN THE AREA. SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window