SANTE FIRST CLINIC
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sante First Clinic's principal activity is to relieve sickness and to preserve the health of patients in a clinic located in Benin, West Africa. This is achieved by providing or assisting with the provision of equipment, facilities and services not normally provided by the statutory authorities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- City Of Westminster
- Benin
Governance
- 03 October 2011: Standard registration
- 09 December 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.83k | £19.92k | £14.96k | £1.38k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.10k | £19.29k | £15.38k | £1.40k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 01 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 17 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/08/2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18/08/2011
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF THE PATIENTS OF SANTE FIRST CLINIC IN BENIN, WEST AFRICA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window