THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF EMMANUEL WITH ST PAUL, PLYMOUTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open for all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking of religious assemblies in schools. Promotion of Christianity through the staging of events and meetings and the distribution of literature. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £767 from 1 government grant(s)
People

21 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 12 August 2010: Previously excepted registration
- EMMANUEL PCC, PLYMOUTH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Bullard | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Yarwood | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pippa Brown | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Shaw | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Nicholson | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Springett | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Bullard | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Wheeler | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pam Edwards | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barrie Bannister-Evans | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Donald Nuttall | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Edward Houlton | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn McGuinness | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Haynes | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Fletcher | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Phillips | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Rose | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robin Brown | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Bev Cree | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Tony Williams | Trustee | 05 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
TIM LYDDON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £194.42k | £197.26k | £213.31k | £447.04k | £385.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £182.90k | £222.63k | £225.10k | £223.37k | £221.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.00k | £1.15k | £5.20k | £1.64k | £767 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Compton Avenue
Mannamead
Plymouth
PL3 5BZ
- Phone:
- 01752260317
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window