Accounts and annual returns GATESHEAD VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS COUNCIL

Charity number: 1137389
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 15 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 15 December 2015 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2014 20 October 2015 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 19 October 2015 81 days late