Financial history GATESHEAD VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS COUNCIL

Charity number: 1137389
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2011 30/09/2012 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £1.34m £909.98k £934.78k £583.36k £345.88k
Total expenditure £1.43m £1.06m £903.71k £672.68k £478.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £97.03k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.75k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.18m £807.43k £742.34k £402.59k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £74.12k £64.54k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £1.03k £1.86k £473 £299 N/A
Income - Other £150.72k £100.69k £117.85k £115.93k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.40m £1.03m £863.21k £619.10k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £29.41k £29.31k £40.50k £40.46k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £13.12k N/A