Financial history K9 CRUSADERS

Charity number: 1138278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £87.66k £169.45k £122.98k £153.01k £184.36k
Total expenditure £75.12k £121.83k £119.06k £140.85k £147.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £37.00k £16.14k N/A N/A