CAMBORNE REDRUTH HAYLE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are part of the Methodist Church of Great Britain and act as an umbrella organisation for the 14 churches within the Camborne, Redruth and Hayle area of Cornwall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

56 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cornwall
Governance
- 23 December 2010: Previously excepted registration
- CAMBORNE-REDRUTH METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
56 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Flowerday | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Paul Manley | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sharon Jean Phyall | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|||||||
Gregory Cock | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Judith Isabel Richards | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Richard Howard Saundry | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Linda Joyce Haddock | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Gloria Ann Berriman | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Raymond Frederick Paul Borrett | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Claire Leanne Beavis | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Andrew John Geake | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
JANE MILLS | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Julia Arthur | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Jennie Eva | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Kath Navratil | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Ray Chubb | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Keith Andrew Osborn | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
Tracey Hunt | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
NICK NAVRATIL | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
JAYNE MURIEL ROGERS | Trustee | 16 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
MRS ANN HOSKING | Trustee | 16 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
MRS SHIRLEY THOMAS | Trustee | 16 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
REV ANDREW DAVID SOWDEN | Trustee | 16 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
MRS PAM WILLS | Trustee | 16 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
DEMELZA JANE KNIGHT | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Neil Harvey | Trustee | 11 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
MARGARET JOAN PENNA BSC | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Margaret Saundry | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Mr Barrie Baker | Trustee | 14 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
MRS JENNIFER WILLAMS | Trustee | 15 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||
SUSAN CAROL VOISEY | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Mr Ron Eathorne | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||
MRS JOAN HARVEY | Trustee | 04 May 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MRS ANNE STONE | Trustee | 25 October 2011 |
|
|
||||||
MR RON GEORGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DAVID PAUL MONCKTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
BARBARA ANTHEA TERRILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DENISE ANNE CHUBB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MARY KATHLEEN THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
TREVE HARVEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MRS JEANETTE ELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ALAN ROY BUTTERFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
GILLIAN ELIZABETH REES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DAVID TIMOTHY ALLAN KITLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
REV MARK RICHARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Rev KATHYRN JANE BROOKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MRS WENDY THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PETER ELDRED SIMMONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SUSAN THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MRS ELEANOR BOWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MRS JOYCE NICHOLLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOHN M BACHE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Morwenna Williams | Trustee |
|
||||||||
WILLIAM HENRY HERRING | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MISS LIZ CONGDON | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DEREK LANGDON HEAD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £277.81k | £359.16k | £288.80k | £245.39k | £241.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £212.70k | £241.04k | £323.39k | £272.24k | £339.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) as amended on 01 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Mount Pleasant Close
CAMBORNE
Cornwall
TR14 7RZ
- Phone:
- 01209710741
- Email:
- office@methodist121.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window