Trustees CARMEL MAR THOMA CHURCH,LIVERPOOL
Charity number: 1137808

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JIJO VARUGHESE | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
RINCY MARY CHERIAN | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
JIJO VILAGUPARAKAL KURUVILA KURUVILLA | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr DIVYA MARY SAMUEL | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
BIJU MATHEW | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
VARGHESE MATHEW | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
DR JEENA BINU MATHEW | Trustee | 20 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
SHERLY VARUGHESE | Trustee | 22 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS EDAYADIYIL VARGHESE | Trustee | 22 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elcy varughese | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip VARUGHESE | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
MOBY MATHEW | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
SURESH CHERIYAN GEORGE | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ASISH VARGHESE | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
BINU THOMAS | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Raji john | Trustee | 28 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
V S VARGHESE | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
PRAKASH PHILIP | Trustee | 21 February 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.