EAST NORTON AND TUGBY UNITED CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to individuals for relief of hardship
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 05 October 1971: Standard registration
- CHARITY OF ROBERT WILSON (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Halliwell | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alyson Rees | Trustee | 03 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Vera Pawley | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
GAIL ANNE SQUIRE | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN EDWARD DYSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET DOUGHTY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.65k | £1.64k | £1.64k | £1.68k | £1.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.42k | £1.45k | £1.32k | £1.03k | £1.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 15 JANUARY 1915
Charitable objects
1)YEARLY SUM TO WILSON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES 2)YEARLY SUM TO EACH OF TEN PERSONS IN THE PARISH OF TUGBY 3)GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF TUGBY.
Area of benefit
CIVIL PARISHES OF EAST NORTON AND TUGBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
TUGBY HOUSE
CHAPEL LANE
TUGBY
LEICESTER
LE7 9WA
- Phone:
- 01162598497
- Email:
- Janetdoughty2004@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window