EAST HAM CONGREGATIONAL & METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of regular public acts of worship in person or via Zoom, open to members of the church and non-members alike. The provision of sacred space/building for prayer and contemplation. The teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas both financially and prayer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

8 Trustee(s)
29 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Newham
Governance
- 28 October 2010: Previously excepted registration
- PILGRIMS WAY CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dorothy Greaves | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Stokes | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelechi Uneze -Ogu | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Josie Galang | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
EMMANUEL MENSAH ASIEDU | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANNETTE JAIRAJ | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Jex | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN STINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.64k | £99.64k | £87.12k | £69.89k | £104.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.03k | £102.03k | £84.26k | £109.25k | £107.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 November 2023 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 November 2023 | 135 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 August 2022 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 August 2022 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)"
Charitable objects
The purpose of the Charity is to advance the Christian faith in the Area of Benefit in accordance with the principles and practices of the Participating Churches. In achieving its purpose, the Charity will engage in a range of activities, either on its own or with others, including (but not restricted to): a) the celebration of public worship; b) the teaching of the Christian faith; c) mission and evangelism; d) pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved; e) the provision of facilities with a Christian ethos for the local community, including (but not restricted to) the elderly, the young and other groups with special needs; and f) the support of other charities in the UK and overseas.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pilgrims Way Church
Pilgrims Way
LONDON
E6 1HW
- Phone:
- 020 8552 5030
- Email:
- pilgrimsway2@gmail.com
- Website:
-
Pilgrimsway.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window