Financial history THE TAYLOR FAMILY 2010 CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1138518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £27.83k £3.15k £152 £0 £197.04k
Total expenditure £225.29k £276.07k £602.85k £492.14k £135.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A