Financial history REDLAND WIND BAND

Charity number: 1138545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £12.38k £6.23k £7.78k £9.38k £12.42k
Total expenditure £12.16k £5.55k £8.04k £8.27k £10.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A