ROQUE SANTA CRUZ FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The general goal of the Roque Santa Cruz Foundation is to help children to have a good future, in particularly underprivileged and/or street children, starting in Asuncion, Paraguay. The Foundation intends to improve opportunities for good education by making such education available and in addition provide education in respect of good dietary habits and requirements.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Paraguay
Governance
- 16 December 2010: Standard registration
- 23 September 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2011 | 31/10/2012 | 31/10/2013 | 31/10/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.75k | £6.41k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.69k | £6.41k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2014 | 05 October 2015 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2013 | 24 September 2014 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2012 | 13 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM 22 OCT 2010
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND IF MORE THAN ONE SUCH PROPORTIONS AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window