Financial history CHILDREN'S HUNGER RELIEF FUND UK

Charity Number: 1138753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £142.11k £141.32k £69.72k £39.85k £27.61k
Total expenditure £98.77k £136.17k £97.85k £76.49k £25.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A