BURTON UPON TRENT AND DISTRICT ARTS COUNCIL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The distribution of bursaries to young people involved in the arts and granting small awards to affiliated arts organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 07 October 1971: Standard registration
- 13 January 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 13 January 2023: Funds transferred to 1003451 THE BURTON MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY
- 13 January 2023: Funds transferred to 1072000 LITTLE THEATRE COMPANY
- 13 January 2023: Funds transferred to 1090452 MELLOW DRAMATICS MUSIC THEATRE GROUP
- 13 January 2023: Funds transferred to 519870 GRESLEY MALE VOICE CHOIR
- 13 January 2023: Funds transferred to 502618 ROLLESTON MUSIC CIRCLE AND CHORAL SOCIETY
- 13 January 2023: Funds transferred to 1094168 UTTOXETER CHORAL SOCIETY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7 | £6 | £8 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.58k | £2.67k | £958 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 07 August 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JANUARY 1917 AS AMENDED 17 JUNE 1986
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COUNCIL SHALL BE TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF ARTSTIC PURSUITS AND THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING OR APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF THE BOROUGH OF BURTON-UPON-TRENT AND DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
BURTON-UPON-TRENT AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window