CLOPHILL HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The St Mary's Old Church is a Scheduled Ancient Monument and grade II listed monument halfway along the Greensand Ridge footpath. CHT will manage the restoration to provide access to a safe historic building and education about the church and local history. They will also provide accommodation, healthy activities and traditional (crafting, heritage, building and eco) education for all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 12 November 2010: Standard registration
- CHT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ali Bradbury | Chair | 11 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Doyle | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barry Edward James Charman | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gardner | Trustee | 11 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sally Oldfield | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
David O'Neill | Trustee | 16 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Val Quinn | Trustee | 27 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
John Charles Alexander Wright | Trustee | 02 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.52k | £104.08k | £107.24k | £70.03k | £99.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.88k | £144.10k | £153.20k | £147.04k | £150.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.45k | £12.09k | £6.48k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC PRINCIPALLY WITHIN CLOPHILL, BEDFORDSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA: 1. TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, IN PARTICULAR THE AREA OF THE THE GREENSAND RIDGE; 2. TO PRESERVE BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR OLD ST MARY'S CHURCH IN CLOPHILL; AND 3. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
CLOPHILL, BEDFORDSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clophill Eco Lodge
Old Church Path
Clophill
BEDFORD
MK45 4BP
- Phone:
- 07894710001
- Email:
- info@clophillecolodges.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window