DONCASTER HOUSING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DHYP provides user led accommodation and support services for young people aged 16-25 years living within or with links to Doncaster.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £172,298 from 1 government contract(s) and £59,032 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Doncaster
Governance
- 25 October 2010: Standard registration
- 20 November 2012: Funds received from 1032281 DONCASTER HOUSING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE GROUP
- DHYP LTD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK CHRISTOPHER BRENNAN | Chair | 21 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY PETER NORMAN | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAULA LOUISE RYLATT | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
NATALIE VICTORIA BOWLER-SMITH | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN JACKSON | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE GLADDEN | Trustee | 13 March 2013 |
|
|||||
AMANDA POXTON | Trustee | 21 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £267.78k | £279.28k | £307.99k | £418.82k | £393.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £261.71k | £276.53k | £299.27k | £344.09k | £355.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £158.01k | £160.24k | £157.43k | £161.82k | £172.30k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £440 | £215.69k | £59.03k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 JULY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 MAY 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE INTERESTS OF YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 16 AND 25, IN YORKSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS, WHO ARE HOMELESS, VULNERABLE TO HOMELESSNESS OR INADEQUATELY HOUSED, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING ACCOMMODATION, ADVICE, SERVICES AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
DONCASTER AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o The Foyer
Chequer Road
Doncaster
DN1 2AA
- Phone:
- 01302 738198
- Email:
- admin@dhyp.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window