FREE THE CHILDREN UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity?s activities are: ? To advance in life and help young people by providing support and activities which develop their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as mature and responsible individuals. ? To relieve poverty, advance education, relieve sickness and promote and protect good health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 October 2010: Standard registration
- WE CHARITY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord Rumi Verjee | Chair | 12 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Carlos Vitorino Pinto | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Neil Roskilly | Trustee | 12 February 2015 |
|
|||||
CRAIG BURKINSHAW | Trustee | 29 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.27m | £147.30k | £213.85k | £5.00k | £9.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.88m | £635.64k | £121.35k | £257.27k | £7.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £374.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.89m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £377.63k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £122 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.86m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £16.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £57.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.29m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/10/2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17/03/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/05/2015
Charitable objects
4 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. (2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH. (3) SUCH OTHER SIMILAR PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, PROVIDED THAT IT WILL NOT INCLUDE ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005, AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1-4 Kings Parade
Lower Coombe Street
CROYDON
CR0 1AA
- Phone:
- 07720287516
- Email:
- ukyouth@we.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window