BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR MUSIC THERAPY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The British Association for Music Therapy promotes the profession and practice of music therapy, an intervention which helps people whose lives are affected by illness, disability or emotional distress. With a professional and lay membership, BAMT supports training, education, research and the development of music therapy services across the UK. Publishes the British Journal of Music Therapy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 December 2010: Standard registration
- BAMT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eleanor Tingle | Chair | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
GREGORY PETER JAMES HANFORD | Trustee | 31 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP MICHAEL MATON | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jeffery Jeffery | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Sullivan | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Elizabeth Kirkwood | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Jane Rogers | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Jane Warner | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Patricia Davies | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nirupar Hasna Uddin | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Laura Al-Bandar | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.11k | £183.77k | £252.51k | £439.07k | £200.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.53k | £190.04k | £209.58k | £422.35k | £256.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/03/2011 as amended on 12 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC THERAPY AND THE USE AND DEVELOPMENT OF MUSIC THERAPY FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH A WIDE RANGE OF NEEDS, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN MUSIC THERAPY, AND TO PROMOTE UNDERSTANDING OF MUSIC THERAPY FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED.
Linked charities
- 30 December 2010 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
86 - 90 PAUL STREET
LONDON
EC2A 4NE
- Phone:
- 02078376100
- Email:
- info@bamt.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window