Financial history OCEAN (CHESHIRE) LIMITED

Charity number: 1138927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.02k £112 £1.41k £1.20k £1.00k
Total expenditure £1.72k £415 £839 £1.62k £1.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A