OCEAN (CHESHIRE) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This year Ocean has organized many different events to help bring the local and surrounding community together. Families had a fabulous time at a local park enjoying and taking part in many games, face painting, eating and socializing together. Our Black History event bought schools and other ethnic groups together who enjoyed a talk and slide show, a quiz, and live music to help celebrate
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 11 November 2010: Standard registration
- O.C.E.A.N. (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
dionne johnson | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
peter elcock | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
LECK MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.02k | £112 | £1.41k | £1.20k | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.72k | £415 | £839 | £1.62k | £1.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/04/2010
Charitable objects
THE ORGANISATION IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CREWE AND NANTWICH AND SURROUNDING AREA WHETHER THE MEMBERS FO THE COMPANY OR NOT, AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO ARE OF AFRO CARIBBEAN OR AFRICAN ORIGIN WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, RACE OR POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINION. A) ADVANCE IN EDUCATION IN GOOD CITIZENSHIP IN A MULTI-RACIAL, MULTI-CULTURAL AND MULTI-FAITH SOCIETY AND PROMOTING GOOD RACE RELATIONS BETWEEN PEOPLE OF ALL SUCH GROUPS. B) ADVANCE IN EDUCATION CONCERNING THE AFRO-CARIBBEAN AND AFRICAN CULTURES AND HISTORY, EITHER INDEPENDENTLY OR JOINTLY, WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS HAVING SIMILAR OBJECTS. C) TO RELIEVE NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AN ADVICE AND INFORMATION SERVICE. D) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
CREWE AND NANTWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
409 NEWCASTLE ROAD
SHAVINGTON
CREWE
CW2 5EB
- Phone:
- 01270666280
- Email:
- oceancheshire@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window