LANDS END PENINSULA CLT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Increasing the provision of local affordable housing and the development of local food projects within the Lands End Peninsula (our "area of benefit" covers the Cornwall Council Community Network Areas of West Penwith and Hayle & St Ives).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £21,800 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 11 July 2011: Standard registration
- LEPCLT (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUE JAMES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Malcolm Alan Earley | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tim Wotton | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catharine Frances Craig Goodman | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Delia Mary Webb | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHARON JULIE BROLLY | Trustee | 20 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.19k | £8.73k | £114.52k | £127.19k | £22.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.76k | £3.59k | £104.79k | £160.03k | £20.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.50k | £47.49k | £21.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/03/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (AS DEFINED IN ARTICLE 25): 1.1.1 THE PROVISION OF HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; 1.1.2 THE PROVISION FOR THE AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF, OF HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 1.1.3 THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF; 1.1.4 THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT; 1.1.5 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT; 1.1.6 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; 1.1.7 THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT INCLUDING THE CONSERVATION, RESTORATION AND RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF TREES IN PARTICULAR BROAD LEAFED TREES PLANTS AND ALL FORMS OF WILDLIFE AND THEREBY TO SECURE THE ENJOYMENT BY THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; 1.1.8 THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES;
Area of benefit
CORNWALL COUNCIL COMMUNITY NETWORK AREAS OF WEST PENWITH AND HAYLE & ST IVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Just Library
Market Street
St. Just
PENZANCE
Cornwall
TR19 7HX
- Phone:
- 01736788705
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window