DINGLEY FAMILY AND SPECIALIST EARLY YEARS CENTRES

Charity number: 1137609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO ADVANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AND DISABILITIES (SEND) BY: PROVIDING SAFE AND STIMULATING PLAY; SUPPORTING THEIR PARENTS, AND; PROVIDING ADVICE AND TRAINING TO HEALTH AND EDUCATION PROFESSIONALS, ALL OF WHICH CONTRIBUTE TO BUILDING WIDER INCLUSION FOR CHILDREN.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 August 2010: Standard registration
  • 20 January 2012: Funds received from 299015 DINGLEY FAMILY & SPECIALIST EARLY YEARS CENTRES
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • DINGLEY'S PROMISE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Russell Ashley Fowler Chair 26 November 2020
None on record
Marwa Farouq Ali Alhefnawi Trustee 01 June 2024
None on record
Andrew Logie Trustee 29 January 2024
None on record
Sarah Clarke Trustee 17 November 2023
None on record
James Laidlaw Trustee 17 November 2023
None on record
Cheryl Warren Trustee 17 November 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Charlotte Roles Trustee 01 May 2023
None on record
Helen Elizabeth Williams Trustee 01 May 2023
None on record
Masako Eguchi-Bacon Trustee 18 March 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £647.52k £802.13k £852.21k £991.38k £1.58m
Total expenditure £645.20k £749.43k £851.88k £1.02m £1.60m
Income from government contracts N/A £101.80k £101.80k £239.21k £523.03k
Income from government grants £133.24k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £103.95k £64.78k £166.80k £150.65k £120.96k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £309.16k
Income - Charitable activities £534.98k £732.53k £684.92k £839.92k £1.14m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £774 £921 £483 £0 £1.56k
Income - Other £7.81k £3.90k £0 £813 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £500 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £560.79k £664.10k £763.60k £928.95k £1.48m
Expenditure - Raising funds £84.41k £85.33k £88.28k £92.02k £120.31k
Expenditure - Governance £3.96k £0 £0 £2.94k £61.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £69.74k £82.28k £58.54k £43.50k £39.06k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £220.14k £271.94k £314.61k £428.48k £377.82k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £70.21k £81.83k £100.45k £228.86k £198.51k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 11 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
COMMUNITY CENTRE
KENNET WALK
READING
RG1 3GD
Phone:
01183277424