PEAK CYCLE LINKS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the construction of cycle trails/paths in the High Peak.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 17 November 2010: Standard registration
- 13 October 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.61k | £2.06k | £794 | £796 | £752 | |
|
Total expenditure | £960 | £841 | £969 | £880 | £864 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 JULY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 27 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROMOTION OF HEALTHY RECREATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE BY CONSTRUCTING AND MAINTAINING TRAILS IN NORTH-WEST DERBYSHIRE AND THE ADJOINING AREAS FOR RECREATIONAL USE BY THE GENERAL PUBLIC FOR WALKING AND CYCLING AND WHERE POSSIBLE, HORSE RIDING AND USE BY PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES INCLUDING USERS OF MOBILITY SCOOTERS AND WHEELCHAIRS. (2) THE PROMOTION OF THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT BY ACTIVITIES TO ENCOURAGE SUSTAINABLE TRANSPORT.' THESE ARE ITS CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE 2006 ACT. FOR AS LONG AS THE COMPANY IS A CHARITY, ITS PURPOSES MAY ONLY BE ALTERED WITH THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY CONDITIONS ATTACHED TO SUCH CONSENT.
Area of benefit
NORTH-WEST DERBYSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window