GLOBAL SKILLS AND EMPLOYMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brent
- Ealing
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Hillingdon
- Hounslow
Governance
- 23 December 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nasir Warsama | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
MAHAMED OSMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 APRIL 2007 AS AMENDED BY 25 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE, PRIMARILY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS AND SOMALI CITIZENS LIVING IN WEST LONDON, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS 2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE PRIMARILY OF THE SOMALI COMMUNITY IN EALING 3 TO WORK WITH ALL ORGANISATIONS WHO ARE DELIVERING SIMILAR SERVICES FOR THE SOMALI COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
WEST LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAWCKO HOUSE
35 HORN LANE
ACTON
W3 6NS
W3 6NS
- Phone:
- 02088962889
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window