CHURCHES IN COMMUNITIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CiC International provides accreditation, accountability, recognition, representation and mutual support in Christian ministry for independent member churches, ministries and chaplaincies, networks and their ministers in matters regarding the Christian faith. CiC advances the Christian faith, provides relief of poverty and promotes the efficiency and effectiveness of Christian charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Barbados
- Ghana
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Uganda
Governance
- 16 November 2010: Standard registration
- CIC INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV DR HUGH JAMES OSGOOD | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Rev TREVOR HOWARD | Trustee | 07 October 2016 |
|
|||||||||
REV Kofi Banful | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
STEVE WOODCOCK | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
REV NOEL MCLEAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
REV CELIA COLLINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.80k | £101.31k | £115.71k | £129.24k | £113.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.97k | £100.36k | £96.66k | £134.51k | £121.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.86k | £20.44k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 30 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
THE ORGANISATION'S OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC:- 3.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD AND BY SUCH MEANS BEING CHARITABLE AS THE BOARD MEMBERS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE; 3.2 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS, FACILITIES OR SERVICES; AND 3.3 TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF OTHER CHARITIES.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
CIC INTERNATIONAL
ST PAUL'S HOUSE
EDISON ROAD
BROMLEY
BR2 0EP
- Phone:
- 02084647774
- Email:
- contact@cicinternational.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window