DISABILITY RIGHTS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Disability Rights UK is the largest UK organisation led by people with all types of impairment or health condition. We are disabled people leading change, working to strengthen the voice of disabled people to make our rights real and to create a society where everyone with lived experience of disability or health conditions can participate equally as full citizens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,725,341
Donations and legacies | £79.03k | |
Charitable activities | £1.62m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £22.32k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,724,705
Raising funds | £54.62k | |
Charitable activities | £1.67m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £20,625 from 1 government contract(s) and £125,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £54.62k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.67m | |
Retained for future use | £636 |
People

26 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 October 2010: Standard registration
- 07 January 2014: Funds received from 1113427 NATIONAL CENTRE FOR INDEPENDENT LIVING (NCIL)
- 07 January 2014: Funds received from 1063115 DISABILITY ALLIANCE EDUCATIONAL AND RESEARCH ASSOC...
- 07 January 2014: Funds received from 273150 THE ROYAL ASSOCIATION FOR DISABILITY RIGHTS
- 08 October 2020: Funds received from 1126386 DSA-QAG
- DRP (Working name)
- THE DISABILITY RIGHTS PARTNERSHIP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nana Kabagwira | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Edward Walden | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Livingstone-Thompson | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fiona Creaby | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Ivreen Nevin | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clenton Farquharson MBE | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Naomi Louise Catherine Jacobs | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Liz Leach Murphy | Trustee | 04 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
GREGORY STEWART SMITH | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shelley Simmonds | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mostafa Attia | Trustee | 02 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.40m | £1.47m | £1.45m | £1.63m | £1.73m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.26m | £1.34m | £1.44m | £1.61m | £1.72m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £23.53k | £4.50k | £5.40k | £120.00k | £20.63k | |
|
Income from government grants | £224.20k | £240.00k | £120.00k | N/A | £125.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £134.17k | £114.99k | £156.24k | £101.84k | £79.03k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £62.73k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.26m | £0 | £1.29m | £1.52m | £1.62m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £628 | £4.68k | £22.32k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £1.29m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £45.32k | £20.03k | £10.39k | £11.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.19m | £1.22m | £1.37m | £1.52m | £1.67m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £69.17k | £60.42k | £69.48k | £86.76k | £54.62k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £4.94k | £13.74k | £3.81k | £7.55k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £56.79k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.02k | £176 | £13.13k | £31.37k | £22.24k | |
|
Long-term investments | £6.06k | £6.06k | £6.06k | £6.06k | £6.06k | |
|
Other assets | £641.37k | £789.97k | £734.73k | £808.09k | £764.67k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £474.58k | £490.71k | £439.69k | £512.36k | £459.17k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/10/2011 as amended on 06 Nov 2018 as amended on 25 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (1) TO PROMOTE DISABLED PEOPLE'S INDEPENDENT LIVING AND THEIR SOCIAL INCLUSION BY PREVENTING THEM FROM BEING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED OR BY ASSISTING THEM TO PARTICIPATE AS EQUAL CITIZENS IN SOCIETY; (2) TO PROMOTE THE EQUALITY, DIVERSITY AND RIGHTS OF DISABLED PEOPLE AND THEIR ACCESS TO APPROPRIATE SUPPORT; (3) TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE THE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF DISABLED PEOPLE, AND TO MEET THEIR NEEDS;
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Plexal
14 East Bay Lane
Here East
Queen Elizabeth Olympic Park
Stratford
E20 3BS
- Phone:
- 03309950400
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window