BASSENTHWAITE PARISH ROOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hosting regular classes and club meetings. Used for meetings of community organisations. Venue for entertainment and educational events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 06 August 1984: Standard registration
- BASSENTHWAITE PARISH ROOM (Working name)
- BASSENTHWAITE VILLAGE ROOM (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Isobel Stockdale | Chair | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Ridley | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Elizabeth Webzell | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Cooper-Holmes | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mawson | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARY BREWIS | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Joyce Green | Trustee | 08 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Keith Charles McMillan | Trustee | 26 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALISON MARGARET TRAFFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN REB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VERENA CANNON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HEATHER ANNIE ARMSTRONG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.50k | £16.43k | £29.81k | £20.40k | £27.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.80k | £10.99k | £13.64k | £18.56k | £23.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.64k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 06/08/1984 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27/03/2013
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BASSENTHWAITE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BASSENTHWAITE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bassenthwaite Parish Room
School Road
Bassenthwaite
Keswick
Cumbria
CA12 4QH
- Phone:
- 01768776918
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window