THE STACPOOLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Stacpoole Trust holds property at Trott Street Battersea that is used to provide a Roman Catholic Church for the local community. The sale in 2005 of part of the property (the old primary school) provided funds to construct new parish facilities and do some refurbishment to the Church. Work began in Spring 2011 and was completed a year later. This work used up all the charity's funds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 10 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PETER ROBERT BREALEY | Trustee | 01 June 2004 |
|
|
||||
Rev PATRICK ANTHONY SHERLOCK | Trustee | 01 June 2004 |
|
|
||||
Rev KIERAN PATRICK ANDERSON SDB | Trustee | 01 June 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 26 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
((1) SUBJECT TO THE PROVISIONS OF THIS CLAUSE, THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO FURTHER THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK. (2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE USED TO FURTHER THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE BISHOP MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT IT MAY BE USED: (A) AS A SITE FOR, OR OTHERWISE FOR THE PURPOSES OF, A ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH FOR THE PERFORMANCE OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION, IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH REGULATIONS AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE APPROVED BY THE BISHOP; (B) AS A SITE FOR, OR OTHERWISE FOR THE PURPOSES OF, A RESIDENCE FOR THE PRIEST OR ALL OR ANY OF THE PRIESTS BY WHOM THE SAID CHURCH SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE SERVED UNDER THE APPOINTMENT AND WITH THE CONTINUED APPROBATION AND PERMISSION OF THE BISHOP (C) AS A SITE FOR OR OTHERWISE FOR THE PURPOSES OF A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF POOR OR OTHER CHILDREN (EITHER GRATUITOUSLY OR OTHERWISE) AS ROMAN CATHOLICS, WHICH SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS MAY OR MAY NOT INCLUDE A RESIDENCE OR RESIDENCES FOR THE PERSONS OR ANY PERSON ENGAGED IN TEACHING SUCH CHILDREN OR ANY OF THEM AND SHALL BE ATTACHED TO SUCH ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH OR MISSION AND IN ALL RESPECTS BE MANAGED AND CONDUCTED BY SUCH PERSON OR PERSONS AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH SUCH RULES AND REGULATIONS AND UNDER SUCH SUPERVISION AND GENERALLY IN SUCH MANNER AS THE BISHOP SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME APPROVE OR DIRECT; AND (D) FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES FOR THE PROMOTION OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION OR EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF ROMAN CATHOLICS AS THE BISHOP SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME APPROVE.
Area of benefit
SOUTHWARK
Contact information
- Address:
-
SALESIAN PROVINCIAL OFFICE
THORNLEIGH HOUSE
SHARPLES PARK
BOLTON
BL1 6PQ
- Phone:
- 01204600720
- Email:
- ECONOMER@SALESIANS.ORG.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window