LEARNING & DEVELOPMENT CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The current main activities of the charity are: 1) Supplementary education classes for disadvantaged children and young people aged 5 -18 2) Extracurricular Activities (sport activities & nutritional & healthy eating lessons) 3) Home-language classes with ethical lessons; 4) Drop-in advice & information provision/communityevents; 5) Partnership/networking & safeguarding training/workshops
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brent
- Camden
- City Of Westminster
- Haringey
Governance
- 02 November 2010: Standard registration
- 12 July 2011: Funds received from 1089303 LEARNING & DEVELOPMENT CENTRE
- LEARNING & DEVELOPMENT CENTRE (LDC) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Azeb Geta | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abebe Teka | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sara Tesfu | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MULATU | Trustee | 28 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Muluberhan Jemaw | Trustee | 30 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.71k | £43.50k | £33.09k | £63.29k | £51.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.47k | £30.68k | £37.69k | £60.07k | £55.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.50k | £22.06k | N/A | £15.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 JULY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 18 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF DISADVANTAGED ETHNIC MINORITY PARENTS AND CARERS BY: A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; B) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH; C) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE THROUGH: A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 3. THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A) THE PROMOTION OF COMPUTER RE-USE, RECLAMATION AND RECYCLING; B) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF WASTE GENERATION, WASTE MANAGEMENT AND WASTE RECYCLING.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
71 Kingsgate Road
London
NW6 4JY
- Phone:
- 02076240652
- Email:
- admin@ldcentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window