CP CUMBRIA LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CP Cumbria aims are to support people of all ages with cerebral palsy or an associated disability, who live in Cumbria. We offer a support service providing advocacy, up to date information, support and signposting as part of our service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 22 February 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 06 January 2011: Standard registration
- 25 February 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CP CUMBRIA (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 22/02/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £245.03k | £243.69k | £218.27k | £229.75k | £183.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £278.18k | £258.79k | £235.74k | £230.07k | £199.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 22 February 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 22 February 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 22 February 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 22 February 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 22 February 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 22 February 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 22 February 2019 | 04 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 February 2019 | 04 November 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 JULY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 3 NOVEMBER 2010 AND REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 24 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CARE AND WELFARE OF THOSE WITH CEREBRAL PALY AND SIMILAR CONDITIONS PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, WITHIN CUMBRIA BY TH PROVISION OF SERVICES, SUPPORT AND TRAINING TO THOSE INDIVIDUALS INCLUDING BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO SERVICES RELATING TO HEALTH CARE, WELFARE, MEDICAL TREATMENT, EDUCATION, EMPLOYMENT ACCOMMODATION AND ADVICE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window