Accounts and annual returns KHARIS MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1139291
Charity reporting is overdue by 23 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 23 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 23 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 25 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 25 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 13 February 2024 289 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 13 February 2024 289 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 16 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 16 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 26 February 2022 332 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 26 February 2022 332 days late Download Open in new window