GIRL CHILD NETWORK WORLDWIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
REPLICATION OF GIRL CHILD EMPOWERMENT MODEL IN FIVE AFRICAN COUNTRIES WITH RWANDA RECENTLY SUPPORTED TO SET UP AND ENSURE GIRLS ARE EMPOWERED AND EDUCATED TO REACH THEIR POTENTIAL. GIRLS EMPOWERMENT AND EDUCATION FUND IS SET UP FOR GIRLS IN AFRICA TO ACCESS IN CASES OF EMERGENCIES WHERE THEIR LIVES ARE THREATENED BY POVERTY ,MAN MADE AND NATURAL DISASTERS.WE ADVOCATE FOR POLICY CHANGE FOR GIRLS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2017
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of London
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
- Rwanda
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- Uganda
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 18 November 2010: Standard registration
- GCNW (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PRINCESS 'DEUN ADEDOYIN-SOLARIN | Chair | 23 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Princess Audrey Olutoyin Aboduwa | Trustee | 11 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
NNEKA MACGREGOR | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA BANDA | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2013 | 30/08/2014 | 30/08/2015 | 30/08/2016 | 30/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.30k | £10.70k | £13.75k | £7.50k | £8.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.16k | £9.12k | £9.97k | £6.80k | £7.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days | |
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 676 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 676 days | |
Annual return | 30 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1041 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1041 days | |
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1406 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1406 days | |
Annual return | 30 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1771 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1771 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS"): A) THE RELIEF OF NEED AND POVERTY; B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND C) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH. THESE OBJECTS SHALL BE UNDERTAKEN PRIMARILY FOR THE BENEFIT OF GIRLS IN AFRICA.
Area of benefit
AFRICA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
102 Gonville Road
THORNTON HEATH
CR7 6DB
- Phone:
- 07737204694
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window