THE DAVID FLETCHER MEMORIAL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation exists to provide support for young double bass players on the cusp of their professional careers. Double bassists aged 21-28 who are resident in the UK are eligible to apply for the support, which will take the form of grants awarded and/or the provision of services, facilities or professional work experience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 October 2011: Standard registration
- 02 April 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 02 April 2019: Funds transferred to 1017213 FRIENDS OF TEES VALLEY YOUTH ORCHESTRA
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £337 | £173 | £120 | £146 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 16 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 22 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 16 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08/10/2011 AS AMENDED ON 18 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF YOUNG MUSICIANS EITHER INDIVIDUALLY OR TO THEIR ORCHESTRAS AND ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES FACILITIES AND FUNDING FOR THEIR MUSICAL DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION BOTH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PART OF ORCHESTRAS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window