Accounts and annual returns The Gathering Gates

Charity number: 1141757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 30 September 2023 12 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 21 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 18 August 2022 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 29 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required