Financial history The Gathering Gates

Charity number: 1141757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £0 £6.00k £7.71k £10.81k £29.55k
Total expenditure £0 £3.60k £16.34k £17.79k £25.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A