Financial history CORFE MULLEN SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1141499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.91k £15.84k £28.78k £9.10k £0
Total expenditure £14.82k £10.06k £12.10k £3.48k £4.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £825 N/A N/A N/A N/A