POLICE FIREARMS OFFICERS ASSOCIATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the company is that of running a charitable association, the object of which is to promote for the public benefit the efficiency of the police, in particular the police firearms services and to relieve the needs of police firearms officers and all others involved in firearms operations in the United Kingdom, and the families and dependants of such officers, by providing f
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£681,104
Donations and legacies | £663.50k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £12.74k | |
Investments | £4.87k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£675,799
Raising funds | £32.40k | |
Charitable activities | £627.96k | |
Other | £15.45k |
£2,787 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £47.84k | |
Charitable expenditure | £627.96k | |
Retained for future use | £5.31k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £47.84k | |
Charitable expenditure | £627.96k | |
Retained for future use | £8.09k |
People

5 Employee(s)
3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 December 2010: Standard registration
- PFOA (Working name)
- POLICE FIREARMS OFFICERS ASSOCN LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angelo Deponeo | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Batt | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Roger | Trustee | 09 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £535.50k | £513.70k | £599.15k | £617.02k | £681.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £449.66k | £493.33k | £686.07k | £692.84k | £675.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.00k | N/A | £88 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £505.90k | £507.94k | £598.12k | £604.09k | £663.50k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.18k | £1.23k | £858 | £11.46k | £12.74k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.42k | £781 | £79 | £1.47k | £4.87k | |
|
Income - Other | £25.00k | £3.74k | £88 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £598.12k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £444.24k | £493.33k | £495.83k | £652.86k | £627.96k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £5.43k | £0 | £0 | £35.23k | £32.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.71k | £5.15k | £0 | £40.52k | £26.73k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £190.24k | £4.76k | £15.45k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £38.22k | £35.71k | £29.58k | £53.48k | £67.96k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £358.11k | £399.25k | £311.11k | £303.82k | £302.35k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £11.24k | £29.49k | £22.15k | £114.59k | £122.29k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JUNE 2010. AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE EFFICIENCY OF THE POLICE, IN PARTICULAR THE POLICE FIREARMS SERVICES; (B) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF POLICE FIREARMS OFFICERS AND ALL OTHER OFFICERS INVOLVED IN FIREARMS OPERATIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, AND THE FAMILIES AND DEPENDENTS OF SUCH OFFICERS BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 19/20
South Fens Business Centre
Fenton Way
CHATTERIS
Cambridgeshire
PE16 6TT
- Phone:
- 01354 697890
- Email:
- info@pfoa.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window