Financial history OXFORD UNIVERSITY STUDENT UNION

Charity number: 1140687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.12m £1.01m £1.14m £1.14m £1.13m
Total expenditure £1.26m £985.78k £1.14m £937.51k £1.12m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £47.10k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £879.02k £900.13k £879.03k £914.31k £964.10k
Income - Other trading activities £232.73k £111.21k £213.66k £198.20k £155.08k
Income - Charitable activities £5.59k £1.89k £8.17k £9.28k £4.24k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £804 £281 £39.03k £18.68k £11.36k
Income - Legacies £0 £900.13k £879.03k £914.31k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.07m £846.70k £952.37k £727.09k £1.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £191.63k £139.09k £189.64k £210.42k £116.25k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £46.87k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0