BRITISH SOCIETY OF SKELETAL RADIOLOGISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Aims of the Society are to: To encourage the study and improve the standard of knowledge of imaging of the musculoskeletal and allied systems. To provide advice in the practice and training of musculoskeletal imaging. To arrange scientific meetings on topics of interest in the field of musculoskeletal imaging.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 March 2011: Standard registration
- BSSR LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Sri Priya Suresh | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr David McKean | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Edward Anthony Sellon | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Radhesh Krishna Lalam | Trustee | 15 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.59k | £94.95k | £84.58k | £116.68k | £98.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.63k | £65.65k | £38.54k | £127.64k | £78.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1 | £1 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1 | £1 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 May 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 01 May 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 July 2023 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 18 July 2023 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 12 May 2022 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 12 May 2022 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM 22 JUN 2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE FIELD OF MUSCULOSKELETAL IMAGING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 4
Westerton Farm Lane
Killearn
Stirlingshire
G63 9LE
- Phone:
- 07761753632
- Email:
- OFFICE@BSSR.ORG.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window