LIVERPOOL JOHN MOORES UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Liverpool John Moores University Students' Union exists to help all of our members love student life. We do this through running sports, clubs, societies and events; campaigning with and on behalf of students; and offering support, advice and information. We want our students to have the best academic and social experience Liverpool can offer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£4,381,973
Donations and legacies | £1.90m | |
Charitable activities | £35.17k | |
Other trading activities | £94.72k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £2.35m |
Total expenditure:
£1,560,176
Raising funds | £69.98k | |
Charitable activities | £1.49m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £69.98k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.49m | |
Retained for future use | £2.82m |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 05 July 2011: Standard registration
- 03 July 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 03 July 2024: Funds transferred to 1202881 LIVERPOOL JOHN MOORES UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION
- JMSU (Working name)
- LIVERPOOL STUDENT UNION (Previous name)
- LSU (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.49m | £1.31m | £1.17m | £1.48m | £4.38m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.35m | £1.08m | £920.84k | £1.22m | £1.56m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £9.06k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.16m | £1.05m | £1.08m | £1.28m | £1.90m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £191.49k | £176.02k | £52.00k | £119.26k | £94.72k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £140.82k | £81.23k | £45.27k | £78.78k | £35.17k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £12 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.35m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.17m | £993.89k | £834.99k | £1.13m | £1.49m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £103.17k | £88.58k | £85.84k | £89.89k | £69.98k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.40k | £3.39k | £101 | £3.43k | £30.48k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £75.10k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £17.60k | £7.83k | £1.72k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £450.26k | £514.26k | £524.45k | £599.85k | £0 | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£2.83m | -£3.80m | -£3.56m | -£3.16m | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £190.04k | £382.43k | £378.34k | £192.56k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/07/2009 AS AMENDED ON 26/05/2011 AS AMENDED ON 28/03/2013 AS AMENDED ON 25/07/2013 AS AMENDED ON 21 NOV 2016 as amended on 07 Aug 2018 as amended on 07 Aug 2018 as amended on 10 Nov 2022 as amended on 27 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT LIVERPOOL JOHN MOORES UNIVERSITY (LJMU) BY: ? REPRESENTING, SUPPORTING AND ADVISING STUDENTS AT LJMU AND PROMOTING THEIR INTERESTS AND WELFARE ? BEING THE RECOGNISED REPRESENTATIVE CHANNEL BETWEEN STUDENTS AND LJMU, AND ANY OTHER EXTERNAL BODIES ? PROVIDING SOCIAL, CULTURAL, SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FORUMS FOR DISCUSSIONS AND DEBATE FOR STUDENTS’ PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window