UK TELUGU ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UK Telugu Association (UKTA) is a non-religious, non-profit organisation that encourages Women Empowerment,Youth / Students,Culture etc., of Telugu speaking people in the UK to actively participate in the progress of the community that defines their identity. Closely Working with EQUALITY COUNCIL UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 December 2010: Standard registration
- UKTA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amarnath Reddy Chinthapalli | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
RAJASHEKAR KURBA | Trustee | 02 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
ADITHYA VARDHAN ALLADI | Trustee | 02 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANITA RAO Coppisetty | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Geetha Morla | Trustee | 28 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Venkata Padma Killy Dr | Trustee | 18 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.56k | £3.60k | £6.08k | £99.20k | £18.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.37k | £4.21k | £5.03k | £82.13k | £17.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 MAY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 5 DECEMBER 2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 9 DECEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE TELUGU COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, BY: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN TELUGU HISTORY, CULTURE, CUSTOMS AND LANGUAGE. (B) TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. (C) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Padmalayam
Church Street
Goldhanger
MALDON
Essex
CM9 8AR
- Phone:
- 07884002809
- Email:
- vpkilly@yahoo.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window