Sonu & Eva Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Soneva Foundation supports the development of projects that have a positive environmental, social and economic impact.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bangladesh
- Burma
- Maldives
- Thailand
Governance
- 03 November 2010: Standard registration
- SLOW LIFE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- SONEVA FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- THE SLOW LIFE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE SONEVA CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE SONEVA SLOW LIFE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR BRUCE BROMLEY | Trustee | 29 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR SONU SHIVDASANI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EVA MALMSTROM-SHIVDASANI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £326.76k | £585.64k | £2.03m | £1.26m | £231.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £229.84k | £319.54k | £544.71k | £2.18m | £1.44m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £580.47k | £2.03m | £1.26m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £5.17k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £314.78k | £544.71k | £2.18m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £472.01k | £2.12m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £4.76k | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 May 2024 | 196 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 May 2024 | 196 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 December 2023 | 403 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 December 2023 | 403 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14/03/2012 AS AMENDED ON 12/06/2013 as amended on 19 May 2025
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, IN PARTICULAR BY FUNDING AND OTHERWISE ASSISTING WITH CLEAN ENERGY PROJECTS 2 THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO RELIEVE POVERTY 3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BY CONSTRUCTING AND OTHERWISE SUPPORTING EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN IMPOVERISHED COMMUNITIES 4 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE 5 THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN IN NEED IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE 6 FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
King's House
9-10 Haymarket
London
SW1Y 4BP
- Phone:
- 02074865553
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window