LION AID LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LionAid is committed to securing the future of the African lion, Panthera leo. This will be achieved by supporting scientifically relevant research on disease threats, genetic analyses, and population viability assessments. LionAid is dedicated to forming collaborative partnerships with research institutions, universities and other charities to ensure significant conservation outcomes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- Cameroon
- Ethiopia
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Mozambique
- Nigeria
- Senegal
- South Africa
- United States
- Zambia
Governance
- 26 August 2010: Standard registration
- LIONAID (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE MACSWEEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Katrina Bianca Cattani | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bertrand Yves Chardonnet | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin William Ford | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mike Chase | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melody Sylvia Laura Lee-Gattenby | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr William Keith Lindsay | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr PIETER KAT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.72k | £49.44k | £77.22k | £56.14k | £36.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.98k | £42.97k | £61.33k | £83.23k | £48.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 August 2023 | 153 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 August 2023 | 153 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/05/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/03/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 MAY 2023
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF PREDATORS (INCLUDING LIONS) UNDER THE THREAT OF BECOMING AN ENDANGERED SPECIES OR AN EXTINCT SPECIES BY RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT THE THREAT TO SURVIVAL OF PREDATORS AND TO PROMOTE THE CONTINUED EXISTENCE OF PROTECTED AREAS AND HABITATS CRUCIAL TO THE SURVIVAL IN THE WILD, TOGETHER WITH THE PROMOTION OF SCIENTIFIC STUDY AND RESEARCH (INCLUDING THE PUBLICATION OF THE LAWFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH) INTO THE FAMILIAL BEHAVIOUR, MUTUAL INTERDEPENDENCE AND HEALTH OF SUCH PREDATORS AND TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC THROUGH THE DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION REGARDING WAYS IN WHICH PREDATORS, THEIR ENVIRONMENT AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITIES CAN BEST ACHIEVE A SUSTAINABLE FUTURE, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO , THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTAINANCE OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH PROGRAMMES WITHIN THE REGIONS INHABITED BY PREDATORS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 SALISBURY ROAD
DOVER
CT16 1EU
- Phone:
- 01304449491
- Email:
- info@lionaid.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window