TALENT UNLIMITED LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Talent Unlimited helps to advance the musical education of emerging musicians aged 18 plus, in particular but not exclusively, those of Turkish origin through the provision of grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout London
Governance
- 29 November 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Izabella Gorbanova | Trustee | 18 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cristiana Achim | Trustee | 18 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthea Christine Killeen | Trustee | 18 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG ENCER | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Nuran Gungorencan | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ayse Dickson | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Teri Sisa-Mason | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
CANAN FERYAL MAXTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ISMAIL HAKKI GOKMEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LESLIE WILLIAM MACLEOD-MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.07k | £9.33k | £10.93k | £34.19k | £4.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.43k | £17.36k | £22.96k | £44.96k | £11.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JANUARY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF EMERGING MUSICIANS AGED 18 PLUS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THOSE OF TURKISH ORIGIN THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 24
Harley House
Marylebone Road
LONDON
NW1 5HE
- Phone:
- 02079351805
- Email:
- cananr@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window