THE PARISH OF ST PAUL WEST HACKNEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parish of West Hackney is part of the Stepney Episcopal Area of The Diocese of London West Hackney PCC has the responsibility for co-operating with the incumbent of the Parish in promoting in the parish the mission of the Church. It also has maintenance responsibilities for St Paul's Church and Hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hackney
Governance
- 10 August 2010: Previously excepted registration
- WEST HACKNEY PCC (Working name)
- THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARNABAS WITH ST PAUL, WEST HACKNEY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cicely Claudine Etienne | Chair | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matt Williams | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Awopetu | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chelsea Wallace | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Susan HORSFALL | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jolley Harrison GOSNOLD | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christian John ADAMS | Trustee | 20 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andre Beryl Crump | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christina Titilayo SOSANYA | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Justin Charles Gau | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Desiree Beryl CRUMP | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Elaine Layne | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Kakai | Trustee | 09 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Rev William Daniel Niall WEIR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202.75k | £152.39k | £181.61k | £153.30k | £200.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £167.49k | £194.48k | £278.50k | £156.26k | £263.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES AS AMENDED 12 OCTOBER 2011
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Paul's Church
306 Amhurst Road
LONDON
N16 7UE
- Phone:
- 078407627836
- Email:
- niall@spwh.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window