DORCHESTER DISABLED CLUB

Charity number: 1138215
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing recreational and leisure facilities for people with disabilities and elderly people in Dorchester and surrounding area to improve their quality of life.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £9,867
Total expenditure: £11,569

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 September 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kenzie Vivian Lambert Chair 16 May 2024
None on record
Jonathan Trevor Anderson Trustee 02 June 2022
None on record
Susan Ellen Ellis Trustee 02 September 2021
None on record
Christina Mary Curtis Trustee 02 September 2021
None on record
Edward George Ellis Trustee 02 September 2021
None on record
Cynthia Fry Trustee 08 May 2016
None on record
JANET VENDLA STOPFORTH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.86k £1.90k £5.51k £8.26k £9.87k
Total expenditure £17.94k £11.84k £3.96k £15.67k £11.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
31 Manor Road
DORCHESTER
Dorset
DT1 2AX
Phone:
07775553109
Website:

No information available