BLAZE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Blaze is a charity focused on creating opportunities for young people on the most deprived areas of the North East (According to IMD statistics) Our Activities include: Community Outreach Sessions, Weekly Youth Events for a variety of different age groups, actively working with local schools and the to see more opportunity with further education, careers etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 15 February 2011: Standard registration
- 20 July 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 20 July 2020: Funds transferred to 1167964 BLAZE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.90k | £23.72k | £45.37k | £56.50k | £16.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.23k | £37.78k | £41.50k | £47.40k | £30.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 30 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 30 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 16 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
16 January 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 OCTOBER 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 9 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
= TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY EXPRESSIVE ARTS ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. = PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window